THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:56:08 PM
Feloiu, Florin Daniel
CPSO#:
90684
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300 Wellington St N
Hamilton ON L8L 0A4
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 40819
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre |
Hamilton |
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre |
St Catharines |
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph |
Guelph |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FLORIN DANIEL FELOIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELOIU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |