THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:56:03 AM
Banga, Kamaljeet Singh
CPSO#:
90681
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Dayanand Medical College, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
110 W 6th street
Oswego NY 13126
United States
Phone: 315-4569177
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAMALJEET SINGH BANGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANGA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2015 |