skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 1:48:55 AM

Drucker, Aaron Mark

CPSO#: 90678

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RK Schachter Dermatology Centre
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-7546
Fax: 416-323-6236 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

PERC
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416-323-7505
Fax: 416-323-6254
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drucker and Kozloff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Drucker ( CPSO# 90678 )
Dr. N. Kozloff ( CPSO# 91600 )

Business Address:
CAMH
7th Floor
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7546

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:31 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AARON MARK DRUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRUCKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014