THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:38:35 PM
Lysecki, David Lawrence
CPSO#:
90667
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pediatrics, HSC 3W10A
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: 905 521 2100 Ext. 72759
Fax: 905 521 2601
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Palliative Medicine |
Effective:08 Sep 2023 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID LAWRENCE LYSECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYSECKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2015 |