skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/09/22 18:01:03 PM

Zakaria, Hoshang

CPSO#: 90659

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hoshang Zakaria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Zakaria ( CPSO# 90659 )

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HOSHANG ZAKARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKARIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2014