THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:46:51 AM
Paikin, Michelle Joy
CPSO#:
90637
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Haroun, Michelle Joy (used until: 15 Jun 2015 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON L6K 3W7
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 662
Fax: (905) 338-2998
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michelle Paikin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 8 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:05 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHELLE JOY PAIKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAIKIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2013 |