THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:43:12 AM
Rahman, Syed Tanzilur
CPSO#:
90631
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: 9058487100
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SYED TANZILUR RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Nov 2010 to 15 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2014 |