THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 20:49:14 PM
Corsi, Erica Isabelle
CPSO#:
90590
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hunt, Erica Isabelle (used until: 08 Jun 2011 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
875 Carling Ave
The Canadian Medical Protective Ass
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Phone: 6136202152
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERICA ISABELLE CORSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORSI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |