THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:44:30 AM
Gulamhusein, Aliya Fatemah
CPSO#:
90551
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 224
9th Floor, Eaton Building
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3631
Fax: 416-340-3285
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Aliya Gulamhusein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 26 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:06 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALIYA FATEMAH GULAMHUSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GULAMHUSEIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2013 |