THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 11:36:42 AM
Garg, Shashank
CPSO#:
90548
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Nov 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Nov 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON N6A 5C1
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHASHANK GARG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 2022 |