THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:07:58 AM
Downey, Lindsay Holly
CPSO#:
90547
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON L7G 0E3
Phone: (905) 873-3000
Fax: (905) 873-0800
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Lindsay Downey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 12 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LINDSAY HOLLY DOWNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWNEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 04 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 05 Apr 2011 to 04 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2012 |