THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/09/23 0:39:47 AM
Tam, Wilfred Herbie Garcia
CPSO#:
90538
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Portuguese
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
307-672 Brant St
Burlington ON L7R 2H3
Phone: 905-703-1480
Fax: 9053903578
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Wilfred Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILFRED HERBIE GARCIA TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |