THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:18:56 PM
Ahmed, Bedri Usmael
CPSO#:
90513
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Amharic, English, Ethiopian
Education: Jimma University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Centre
for Healthy Communities
2660 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1K 2S3
Phone: (416) 640-7391
Fax: (416) 261-1896
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BEDRI USMAEL AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2009 to 29 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jul 2010 to 29 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2012 |