THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 1:16:26 AM
Andros, Philip Peter
CPSO#:
90511
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 207-9100
Fax: (519)207-9200
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILIP PETER ANDROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDROS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |