THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:37:59 PM
Kuhl, Andrew Gordon
CPSO#:
90504
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1800 8th Street
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW GORDON KUHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUHL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: September 24, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Andrew Kuhl was found guilty of the following offence:
Having over 80 mg blood alcohol concentration within two hours after ceasing to operate a conveyance, contrary to Section 320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date: September 24, 2020
Sentence: 1 year driving prohibition; Fine of $2000