THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:24:45 AM
Narsinghani, Leena
CPSO#:
90494
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43203
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEENA NARSINGHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARSINGHANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - General Pathology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2013 |