THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 1:21:15 AM
El Zaharna, Ramy Mohamed Rizk Saliem
CPSO#:
90465
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Khalifa Bin Zayed Street
al-Dana
Mediclinic AL Noor Hospital
Collaborative Care Center
Aboudhabi
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 001563078445
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ramy El-Zaharna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 5 2022
Medical Records Location
Date Received: 17 Aug 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 May 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAMY MOHAMED RIZK SALIEM EL ZAHARNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL ZAHARNA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2010 |