THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:12:14 AM
Tsai, Gina Yu-Ching
CPSO#:
90458
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:St Josephs Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London, ON N6A 4V2
Date Received: 31 Jul 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Jul 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2014 |