THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 11:43:54 AM
Lerner, Marina
CPSO#:
90453
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HAMILTON SLEEP DISORDERS CLINIC
55 Frid St.
Unit #7
Hamilton ON L8P 4M3
Phone: (905) 529-2259
Fax: 905-529-2262
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:19 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARINA LERNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LERNER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2014 |