THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 4:34:57 AM
Duffett, Lisa Deborah Marie
CPSO#:
90443
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hosptial, General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Box 201A
Room L2244
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71069
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:12 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LISA DEBORAH MARIE DUFFETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFFETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
EL - Hematology
McMaster University, 03 Aug 2009 to 30 Aug 2009
EL - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 8 - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2012 |