THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/12/23 2:39:45 AM
Povitz, Marcus
CPSO#:
90439
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M Povitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:London Health Sciences Centre Records
Phone# 519-685-8500 Ext:58119
Date Received: 03 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:02 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2009 to 20 Jun 2009
EL - Respirology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Respirology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2019 |