THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 10:39:17 AM
Ohene-Darkoh, Charles Ayensu
CPSO#:
90435
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Nov 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Akan, English
Education: Univ of Ghana, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:22 Apr 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHARLES AYENSU OHENE-DARKOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OHENE-DARKOH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2009 |