skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 9:13:58 AM

Kelley, Melissa Dawn

CPSO#: 90431

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Oct 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-3400 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Melissa Kelley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kelley ( CPSO# 90431 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2

Medical Records Location

Address: Upper Canada Lower Bowel Clinic 1366 Yonge Street Toronto, ON M4T 3A7
Date Received: 29 Jul 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELISSA DAWN KELLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
EL - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Mar 2010 to 09 Apr 2010
EL - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2018