THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:20:33 AM
Bulatovic-Stajkovic, Sladjana
CPSO#:
90414
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Nov 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Nis, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Serbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 24 Jul 2009
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
McMaster University, 25 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2014 to 20 Jan 2015
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 21 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Nov 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2017 |