THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:56:27 AM
Dutchak, Peter Anthony
CPSO#:
90389
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
15 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Feb 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:24 May 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2013 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2017 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2019 |