THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 4:10:09 AM
Nour, Rabih
CPSO#:
90382
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Apr 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Apr 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Wayne State University School of Medicin, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 946-2003
Fax: (519) 946-2004
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Rabih Nour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:22 Apr 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Apr 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 21 Oct 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
|
Active |