THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:54:24 AM
Bush, Shirley Harvey
CPSO#:
90373
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Apr 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Apr 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
60 Cambridge St N
Bruyère - Saint-Vincent Hospital
Ottawa ON K1R 7A5
Phone: 613-562-6262
Fax: 613-782-2766
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Palliative Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Apr 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2016 |
|
Active |