THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/09/23 6:58:37 AM
Birch, Corey Tyler
CPSO#:
90372
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 May 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
301-460 Wellington St
St Thomas ON N5R 6H9
Phone: 5196315670
Fax: 5196318570
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Apr 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. COREY TYLER BIRCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRCH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 04 May 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2011 |