skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/10/21 6:38:12 AM

Youssef, Victor Samir Fawzy

CPSO#: 90368

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trinity Medical Centre
Unit 4
2163 Sixth Line
Oakville ON  L6H 3N7
Phone: (905) 582-5030
Fax: (905) 582-5010 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr Victor Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Youssef ( CPSO# 90368 )

Business Address:
2163 Sixth Line
Suite 4
Oakville ON  L6H 3N7
Phone Number: (905) 582-5030

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VICTOR SAMIR FAWZY YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010