THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
21/09/23 3:59:06 AM
Gordon, Sherif Albert Abd El Sayed
CPSO#:
90358
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Glen Derry Professional
Walk-In Clinic
2760 Derry Road West
Mississauga ON L5N 3N5
Phone: (289) 997-3220
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHERIF ALBERT ABD EL SAYED GORDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORDON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Apr 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |