THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:34:32 AM
Hocke, Volker Stephan
CPSO#:
90356
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Philipps University at Marburg, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6861
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Germany
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VOLKER STEPHAN HOCKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOCKE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Apr 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Nov 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 07 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2017 |