skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 0:06:47 AM

Ahmed, Youmna

CPSO#: 90337

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Y. Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ahmed ( CPSO# 90337 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:28 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University Of Toronto, 29 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 11 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2019 Active
             Dr.  Youmna  Ahmed may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
            geriatric medicine, only.