THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/09/23 1:24:59 AM
Khatchadourian, Karine
CPSO#:
90281
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Apr 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Armenian, English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Div of Endocrinology and Metabolism
401 Smyth Road
Room 5004, 5th Floor West
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3239
Fax: (613) 738-4215
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:24 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KARINE KHATCHADOURIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATCHADOURIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 09 Mar 2009 to 05 Apr 2009
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Apr 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2013 |