THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
16/04/24 8:06:20 AM
Mazengia, Getachew Demem
CPSO#:
90248
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Mar 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Amharic, English
Education: Jimma University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. G. Mazengia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 8 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GETACHEW DEMEM MAZENGIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZENGIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Mar 2009 to 23 May 2009
AVP - Community Medicine
Queen's University, 24 May 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Mar 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Mar 2011 to 08 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2011 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: June 18, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: May 27, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)