skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/10/21 10:51:50 AM

Syed, Ikramuddin

CPSO#: 90242

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish, Urdu

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
55 Dusk Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 5Z6
Phone: 905 451 9999 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

11755 Bramalea Rd
Brampton ON  L6R3S9
Canada
Phone: 289-801-8999
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Sep 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IKRAMUDDIN SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 09 Mar 2009 to 20 Jun 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 21 Jun 2009 to 08 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 09 Mar 2010 to 08 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2012