THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:17:30 PM
Rizk, Magdy Girgis Azmy
CPSO#:
90232
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kemptville District Hospital
PO Box 2007
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-6133
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Feb 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 05 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 May 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 May 2012 |
|
Active |