THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/09/23 1:42:03 AM
Serra, Stefano
CPSO#:
90231
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: UNIVERSITA DEGLI STUDI DI CAGLIARI, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11E208
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5049
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:02 Oct 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2009 to 20 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 21 Mar 2009 to 01 Oct 2009
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Oct 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 28 Oct 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Oct 2015 |
|
Active |