THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
09/05/24 21:02:34 PM
Amaral, Andre Carlos Kajdacsy-Balla
CPSO#:
90217
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: U ESTADUAL PAULISTA-BOTUCATU SAO PAOLO, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Room B5 02
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 83666
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:14 Sep 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2009 to 25 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Sep 2010
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2017 |
|
Active |