THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 0:36:11 AM
Pitt, Tracy Joy
CPSO#:
90216
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Howard University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale ON M9W 4L6
Phone: (416) 741-4545
Fax: (416) 744-1484
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:11 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:15 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Feb 2009 to 27 Feb 2009
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2014 |
|
Active |