THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:12:58 PM
McCredie, Victoria Anne
CPSO#:
90214
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Manchester Medical School, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Office 411J, 2 McL
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: 416 603 5800
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VICTORIA ANNE MCCREDIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCREDIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2009 to 25 Mar 2010
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Mar 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2012 |