THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 5:18:12 AM
Glover, Benedict Martin
CPSO#:
90173
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
16 Mar 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Feb 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Benedict Glover Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: July 30, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On August 13, 2021, Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre (the “Hospital”) notified the College, pursuant to s.33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Benjamin Glover’s privileges had been restricted in that he agreed to a voluntary leave of absence, effective July 30, 2021. In addition, Dr. Glover was suspended from his position at the University of Toronto on August 11, 2021. The Hospital subsequently notified the College that Dr. Glover’s privileges were formally suspended by the Hospital on February 23, 2022, and that Dr. Glover resigned from his position at Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre and the University of Toronto effective March 16, 2022.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2009 to 21 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 22 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Dec 2010
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jan 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2019 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 29 Oct 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: August 28, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Benedict Martin Glover to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 28, 2023:
College investigations were conducted into Dr. Glover’s conduct towards a medical resident, and into whether he committed professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his professionalism, administration and management of his practice. During the investigations, Dr. Glover’s membership with the College expired. In the face of these investigations, Dr. Glover has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.
Download Full Document (PDF)