skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/08/21 1:13:53 AM

Mazhar, Mir Nadeem

CPSO#: 90168

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Ct
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 32981
Fax: 905 721 4780 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Mazhar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mazhar ( CPSO# 90168 )

Business Address:
25 Front Avenue West
Brockville ON  K6V 4J2
Phone Number: (613) 342-2262

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9


Corporation Name: Khalid Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:14 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIR NADEEM MAZHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZHAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2009