THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:42:11 AM
Bosch, Mark Jonathan
CPSO#:
90167
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
13 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:12 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 12 Jan 2009 to 24 Jan 2009
EL - Hematology
Queen's University, 25 Jan 2009 to 07 Feb 2009
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2009 to 13 Sep 2009
EL - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Sep 2009 |