THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/09/23 23:14:55 PM
Oraif, Ayman Mohammed Kheder
CPSO#:
90162
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility |
Effective:31 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jan 2009 to 11 Feb 2009
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 11 Mar 2010 to 07 Apr 2010
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Apr 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2015 |