THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 0:29:22 AM
Cruz Pereira, Oscar Octavio
CPSO#:
90116
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:04 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2009 to 25 Jan 2009
EL - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Jan 2009 to 06 Feb 2009
EL - Gastroenterology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 08 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |