THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:32:51 AM
Botha, Nicolaas Jacobus
CPSO#:
90111
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of the Orange Free State, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Nicolaas Botha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 21 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |