THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 23:28:09 PM
Arthurs, James Richard
CPSO#:
90104
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Washington, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Northwestern Health Unit
210 First Street North
Kenora, ON P9N 2K4
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 21 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2014 |