THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:42:05 AM
Subramanian, Priya
CPSO#:
90102
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
12 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Rajah Muthiah Medical College, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PEPP Program LHSC Victoria Hospital
P O Box 5010, Station B
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6662
Fax: (519) 667-6689
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:12 Mar 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Jan 2009 to 16 Feb 2009
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 17 Feb 2009 to 16 Feb 2010
CF - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 17 Feb 2010 to 11 Mar 2010
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jan 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jan 2016 |
|
Active |