THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:50:09 AM
Gupta, Arun Tinku
CPSO#:
90094
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Nov 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Nov 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Hindi
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HHS Henderson General Hospital
Dept of Physical Med & Rehab
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:31 Dec 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARUN TINKU GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2005 to 28 Aug 2005
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 15 Dec 2008 to 11 Jan 2009
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2022 |