THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:07:33 AM
Chen, Innie
CPSO#:
90061
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, French, Mandarin
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 81725
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:23 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. INNIE CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 14 Dec 2008 to 09 Jan 2009
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2011 to 01 May 2011
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 02 May 2011 to 29 May 2011
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 30 May 2011 to 24 Jun 2011
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 28 Jan 2013 to 08 Feb 2013
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2013 |